NJ S1563 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3733
Note: Carry Over of previous A5290
Note: Carry Over of previous A5290
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A2456 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A2456 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that users of Access Link paratransit service are automatically eligible for and enrolled in motor bus and rail passenger discounted fare program.
Title
Provides that users of Access Link paratransit service are automatically eligible for and enrolled in motor bus and rail passenger discounted fare program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A2456 (1R) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2456 (Same As) 2020-08-12 - Approved P.L.2020, c.64.
S3733 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5290 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3733 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5290 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee