NJ S153 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "New Jobs for New Jersey Act."
Title
The "New Jobs for New Jersey Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-11) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S153 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2213 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2213 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S153 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S0500/153_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S153 |