NJ S1526 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3395
Note: Carry Foward to future S2231
Note: Carry Over of previous S1671
Note: Carry Over of previous A2298
Note: Carry Foward to future S2231
Note: Carry Over of previous S1671
Note: Carry Over of previous A2298
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts volunteer fire companies from charitable registration fees.
Title
Exempts volunteer fire companies from charitable registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1526 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1526 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1816 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1671 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2298 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1526 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1816 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1671 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2298 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1526 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1526_I1.HTM |