NJ S1513 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2340
Note: Carry Foward to future S1006
Note: Carry Over of previous A2115
Note: Carry Over of previous S1584
Note: Carry Foward to future S1006
Note: Carry Over of previous A2115
Note: Carry Over of previous S1584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New Jersey Residential Foreclosure Transformation Act."
Title
Establishes the "New Jersey Residential Foreclosure Transformation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A1049 (2R) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Cruz-Perez) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1513 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)
S1513 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)
A1049 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A2115 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1584 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1513 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)
A1049 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A2115 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1584 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading