NJ S1509 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A3333 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A3333 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes microenterprise training program and assistance for microentrepreneurs; gives priority status to projects involving microenterprises under Neighborhood Revitalization Tax Credit Program.*
Title
Establishes microenterprise training program and assistance for microentrepreneurs; gives priority status to projects involving microenterprises under Neighborhood Revitalization Tax Credit Program.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A3333 (1R) |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Turner) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S556 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3333 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.25.
A3333 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.25.