NJ S1501 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A1431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A1431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Board of Education regulations regarding school nurse certification to include certain minimum eligibility requirements.
Title
Requires State Board of Education regulations regarding school nurse certification to include certain minimum eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted by A1431 |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1431 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session