NJ S1500 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3902

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires disclosure by independent expenditure committees.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires disclosure by independent expenditure committees.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1524 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-2-8)
2019-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25SenateConcur by Senate Amendments (33-0) (Singleton)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (60-1-17)
2019-03-25AssemblyMotion To Table (53-24-0) (Greenwald)
2019-03-25AssemblyMotion To Aa (DiMaso)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A1524 (1R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (31-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Singleton)
2019-01-28SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1524 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1500 (4R)
A3902 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S150 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.124.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback