NJ S1495 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires display of State vehicle abuse hotline bumper stickers on all State vehicles.
Title
Requires display of State vehicle abuse hotline bumper stickers on all State vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Passed by the Senate (36-1) | |
2010-03-15 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2515 (Same As) 2010-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee