NJ S1494 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1997
Note: Carry Foward to future A4169
Note: Carry Over of previous S1785
Note: Carry Over of previous S265
Note: Carry Over of previous A2431
Note: Carry Foward to future A4169
Note: Carry Over of previous S1785
Note: Carry Over of previous S265
Note: Carry Over of previous A2431
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning health care service needs of the lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgendered, and queer or questioning individuals, and persons with intersex conditions in the State.
Title
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning health care service needs of the lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgendered, and queer or questioning individuals, and persons with intersex conditions in the State.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1494 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1494 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1785 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S265 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1226
A2431 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1494 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1785 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S265 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1226
A2431 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1494 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1494_I1.HTM |