NJ S1490 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1925
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4972 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4972 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.
Title
Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4972 (ACS/2R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Beach) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1925 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4972 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.493.
A4972 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.493.