NJ S1474 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3338
Note: Carry Over of previous A4867
Note: Carry Over of previous A4867
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to prioritize funding for certain projects for acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes and certain environmental infrastructure projects that include, or allow for, flood mitigation projects.
Title
Requires DEP to prioritize funding for certain projects for acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes and certain environmental infrastructure projects that include, or allow for, flood mitigation projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3338 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4867 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2104 (Same As) 2025-01-14 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4867 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2104 (Same As) 2025-01-14 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1474 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1500/1474_I1.HTM |