NJ S1449 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2230
Note: Carry Foward to future S920
Note: Carry Over of previous A1406
Note: Carry Over of previous S2191

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rates for private duty nursing services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes minimum Medicaid reimbursement rates for private duty nursing services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1449 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1449 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1454 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1406 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2191 (Carry Over) 2021-01-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback