NJ S1443 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A717

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts disabled veterans from certain fees at State parks and forests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts disabled veterans from certain fees at State parks and forests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A521 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A717 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback