NJ S1414 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A158
Note: Carry Over of previous A5787
Note: Carry Over of previous S4092
Note: Carry Over of previous A5787
Note: Carry Over of previous S4092
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs BPU to allow broadband telecommunications service providers to use poles belonging to public utilities or CATV companies in certain instances.
Title
Directs BPU to allow broadband telecommunications service providers to use poles belonging to public utilities or CATV companies in certain instances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1414 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A186 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5787 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S4092 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A186 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5787 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S4092 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1414 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1414_I1.HTM |