NJ S1367 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Deactivates certain committees, councils, panels, and task forces of advisory or temporary nature if entity does not meet or have quorum at least once every year.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deactivates certain committees, councils, panels, and task forces of advisory or temporary nature if entity does not meet or have quorum at least once every year.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (32-0)
2020-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Sweeney)
2020-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback