NJ S1351 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A836
Note: Carry Over of previous A3396
Note: Carry Over of previous S1319
Note: Carry Over of previous S2157
Note: Carry Over of previous A2437
Note: Carry Over of previous A3396
Note: Carry Over of previous S1319
Note: Carry Over of previous S2157
Note: Carry Over of previous A2437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages timely recording of residential deeds.
Title
Encourages timely recording of residential deeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1351 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A985 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3396 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1319 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2157 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2437 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A985 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3396 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1319 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2157 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2437 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1351 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1351_I1.HTM |