NJ S1333 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by A2137 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by A2137 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for educational stability of children placed in resource family homes and that school district of residence for the child shall be present district of residence of parent or guardian.
Title
Provides for educational stability of children placed in resource family homes and that school district of residence for the child shall be present district of residence of parent or guardian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Substituted by A2137 (3R) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2137 (Same As) 2010-09-09 - Approved P.L.2010, c.69.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1333 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1500/1333_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1500/1333_R1.HTM |