NJ S131 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S548
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires bi-state transportation authorities to make advance notification of certain projects or operations expected to impede traffic.
Title
Requires bi-state transportation authorities to make advance notification of certain projects or operations expected to impede traffic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S548 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2320 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2320 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee