NJ S129 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S546
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from gross income taxation military compensation for personnel serving outside of State and combat zone compensation.*
Title
Excludes from gross income taxation military compensation for personnel serving outside of State and combat zone compensation.*
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S546 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2451 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2451 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/129_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S129 |