NJ S129 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S165
Note: Carry Foward to future A4593
Note: Carry Foward to future A4593
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies when penalty points are to be assessed for convictions of driving in an unsafe manner.
Title
Clarifies when penalty points are to be assessed for convictions of driving in an unsafe manner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S129 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S129 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S129 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S0500/129_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S129 |