NJ S1265 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2568
Note: Carry Over of previous A1027
Note: Carry Over of previous A1027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes crime of creating false public alarms as form of bias intimidation.
Title
Includes crime of creating false public alarms as form of bias intimidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A724 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2568 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1027 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2568 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1027 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee