NJ S1254 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1012
Note: Carry Foward to future S330
Note: Carry Foward to future A3804
Note: Carry Over of previous A274
Note: Carry Over of previous S51
Note: Carry Foward to future S330
Note: Carry Foward to future A3804
Note: Carry Over of previous A274
Note: Carry Over of previous S51
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases distribution to municipalities from Energy Tax Receipts Property Tax Relief Fund over five years to restore municipal aid reductions; requires additional aid to be subtracted from municipal property tax levy.
Title
Increases distribution to municipalities from Energy Tax Receipts Property Tax Relief Fund over five years to restore municipal aid reductions; requires additional aid to be subtracted from municipal property tax levy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1254 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A476 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A274 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S51 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A476 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A274 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S51 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1254 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1254_I1.HTM |