NJ S1226 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates teen nights by requiring security provided by police officers, prohibiting persons under age 15 from attending, and disqualifying registered sex offenders from employment.
Title
Regulates teen nights by requiring security provided by police officers, prohibiting persons under age 15 from attending, and disqualifying registered sex offenders from employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1260 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1260 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-21-3) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A1260 (1R) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-5) |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1260 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S1226 (1R)