NJ S1209 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S920
Note: Carry Foward to future A1087
Note: Carry Over of previous S2410
Note: Carry Foward to future A1087
Note: Carry Over of previous S2410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits surgical declawing of cats and other animals.
Title
Prohibits surgical declawing of cats and other animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1209 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1209 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A347 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2410 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1209 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A347 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2410 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee