NJ S1201 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1484
Note: Carry Foward to future A3365
Note: Carry Over of previous S810
Note: Carry Foward to future A3365
Note: Carry Over of previous S810
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "Law Against Discrimination" to include crime victims as protected status.
Title
Amends "Law Against Discrimination" to include crime victims as protected status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1201 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1201 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1014 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S810 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1201 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1014 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S810 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee