NJ S119 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2041
Note: Carry Foward to future A2193
Note: Carry Over of previous S3048
Note: Carry Foward to future A2193
Note: Carry Over of previous S3048
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidates for President and Vice-President of United States to disclose federal income tax returns to appear on ballot; prohibits Electoral College electors from voting for candidates who fail to file income tax returns.
Title
Requires candidates for President and Vice-President of United States to disclose federal income tax returns to appear on ballot; prohibits Electoral College electors from voting for candidates who fail to file income tax returns.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-11) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Motion To Table (24-11) (Weinberg) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Pennacchio) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S119 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S119 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3048 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A1230 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S119 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3048 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A1230 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S119 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/119_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S119 |