NJ S1154 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3506
Note: Carry Over of previous A4050
Note: Carry Over of previous A4050
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE to develop guidelines for school districts and charter schools concerning school discipline that are consistent with certain federal guidelines.
Title
Directs DOE to develop guidelines for school districts and charter schools concerning school discipline that are consistent with certain federal guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3506 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4050 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4050 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee