NJ S1146 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1704
Note: Carry Foward to future S1000
Note: Carry Over of previous A5860
Note: Carry Over of previous S4280
Note: Carry Foward to future S1000
Note: Carry Over of previous A5860
Note: Carry Over of previous S4280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires domestic violence orders to be issued in other languages in addition to English under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires domestic violence orders to be issued in other languages in addition to English under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1146 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1078 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5860 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S4280 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1146 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1078 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5860 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S4280 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1146 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1146_I1.HTM |