NJ S1146 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A2619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A2619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Title
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | Senate | Substituted by A2619 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading (without recommendation) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2619 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Approved P.L.2015, c.61.