NJ S1138 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1073
Note: Carry Foward to future A3951
Note: Carry Over of previous S1035
Note: Carry Over of previous A3539
Note: Carry Foward to future A3951
Note: Carry Over of previous S1035
Note: Carry Over of previous A3539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to make list of drugs with "black box" warnings accessible through its website.
Title
Requires DOH to make list of drugs with "black box" warnings accessible through its website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1138 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1138 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1035 (Carry Over) 2018-01-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3078 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3539 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1138 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1035 (Carry Over) 2018-01-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3078 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3539 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1138 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1138_I1.HTM |