NJ S1111 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S566
Note: Carry Foward to future A1309
Note: Carry Over of previous S149
Note: Carry Foward to future A1309
Note: Carry Over of previous S149
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.
Title
Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1111 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1111 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A406 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S149 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1111 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A406 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S149 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee