NJ S111 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2654

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits use of education, occupation, homeownership status, marital status, or credit score in certain automobile insurance determinations.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits use of education, occupation, homeownership status, marital status, or credit score in certain automobile insurance determinations.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (22-9)
2021-01-11SenateSenate Amendment (21-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2020-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2654 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1657 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback