NJ S1106 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1465

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs DOH to develop plan to phase out use of latex gloves in health care facilities and food establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs DOH to develop plan to phase out use of latex gloves in health care facilities and food establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1465 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3880 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback