NJ S1072 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1094
Note: Carry Over of previous A3025
Note: Carry Over of previous S4090
Note: Carry Over of previous A5705
Note: Carry Over of previous A3025
Note: Carry Over of previous S4090
Note: Carry Over of previous A5705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits young adult who is claimed as a dependent on relative's tax return to receive Work First New Jersey General Public Assistance benefits.
Title
Permits young adult who is claimed as a dependent on relative's tax return to receive Work First New Jersey General Public Assistance benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1094 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3025 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4090 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5705 (Carry Over) 2021-06-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.112.
A3025 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4090 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5705 (Carry Over) 2021-06-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.112.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1072 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1072_I1.HTM |