NJ S1040 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Substituted by A2260 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Substituted by A2260 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lengthens service life of certain school buses to 15 years.
Title
Lengthens service life of certain school buses to 15 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Substituted by A2260 (2R) | |
2011-06-06 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2260 (Same As) 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.130.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1040 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1500/1040_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1500/1040_R1.HTM |