NJ S1034 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns special needs trusts for persons with developmental disabilities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns special needs trusts for persons with developmental disabilities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2013-02-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2013-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-01-23SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3834 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback