NJ S1016 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1621
Note: Carry Over of previous A468
Note: Carry Over of previous A468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State agencies to make their websites accessible to people with disabilities and on mobile devices.
Title
Requires State agencies to make their websites accessible to people with disabilities and on mobile devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1621 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A468 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3636 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A468 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3636 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee