NJ S1 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1
Note: Carry Foward to future A3389
Note: Carry Over of previous S1
Note: Carry Foward to future A3389
Note: Carry Over of previous S1
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages sharing of services; makes appropriations.
Title
Encourages sharing of services; makes appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2929 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2929 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S1 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/1_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S1 |