NJ AR92 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR23
Note: Carry Over of previous AR80
Note: Carry Over of previous AR80
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass "Community Broadband Act."
Title
Urges Congress to pass "Community Broadband Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (70-0-1) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR92 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR80 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
SR98 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
AR80 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
SR98 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR92 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/92_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR92 |