NJ AR38 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR79
Note: Carry Over of previous AR190
Note: Carry Over of previous SR85
Note: Carry Over of previous AR190
Note: Carry Over of previous SR85
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes October 13, 2020 as "Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Recognizes October 13, 2020 as "Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR38 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
AR190 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SR85 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR190 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SR85 (Carry Over) 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/AR38 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/AR/38_I1.HTM |