NJ AR200 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges DEP to revise and update Statewide Water Supply Plan and urges citizens of State to conserve water.
Title
Urges DEP to revise and update Statewide Water Supply Plan and urges citizens of State to conserve water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (70-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR93 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Filed with Secretary of State