NJ AR163 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court and Attorney General to revise their jointly-created County Domestic Violence Working Groups to add additional members and responsibilities.
Title
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court and Attorney General to revise their jointly-created County Domestic Violence Working Groups to add additional members and responsibilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR70 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AR163 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AR/163_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR163 |