NJ AR154 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urges enactment of the "Repeated Objectionable Bothering of Consumers on Phones Act" (ROBOCOP Act).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges enactment of the "Repeated Objectionable Bothering of Consumers on Phones Act" (ROBOCOP Act).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2016-09-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-1-4)
2016-09-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-06-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

SR62 (Same As) 2016-07-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback