NJ AR128 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for federal Dorothy I. Height and Whitney M. Young Jr. Social Work Reinvestment Act.
Title
Expresses support for federal Dorothy I. Height and Whitney M. Young Jr. Social Work Reinvestment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-02-17 | Passed by the Assembly (48-16-12) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-09 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |