NJ AR113 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR60
Note: Carry Over of previous SR136
Note: Carry Over of previous SR136
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges enactment of federal "Maternal Health Accountability Act of 2017."
Title
Urges enactment of federal "Maternal Health Accountability Act of 2017."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (72-0-1) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR113 (Carry Over) 2018-05-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR18 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR136 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR18 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR136 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AR113 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AR/113_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR113 |