NJ AJR95 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR90
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by SJR35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by SJR35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designating October 6 as "Knock Out Opioid Abuse Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designating October 6 as "Knock Out Opioid Abuse Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR35 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR35 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-16.
SJR90 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR90 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR95 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/95_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR95 |