NJ AJR87 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR25
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR43
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR43
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes 100th anniversary of Farm Credit East Program.
Title
Recognizes 100th anniversary of Farm Credit East Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR87 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
AJR87 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR45 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
AJR87 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR45 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR87 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/87_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR87 |