NJ AJR83 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR110
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full week of June each year as "New Jersey Fishing and Boating Week."
Title
Designates first full week of June each year as "New Jersey Fishing and Boating Week."
Sponsors
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR110 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
SJR95 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SJR95 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR83 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/83_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR83 |