NJ AJR78 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR48
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates second full week in September as "Direct Support Professional Recognition Week." *
Title
Designates second full week in September as "Direct Support Professional Recognition Week." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR48 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee