NJ AJR24 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR13
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR46
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR46
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates "Crossing Guard Appreciation Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates "Crossing Guard Appreciation Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR13 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR40 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SJR46 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR40 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SJR46 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR24 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/24_I1.HTM |